Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
20.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.1989 [1989/15] |
16.07.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] |
20.10.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 10.12.1986 [1986/50] |
19.12.1985 | Change - applicant | published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] |
02.08.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] |