Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4006585 | Global Dossier | 03.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US59529184 | 30.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0156774 | Global Dossier | 10.12.1986 | A3 | EP0156774 | 02.10.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US59529184 | 30.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8501488 | 26.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US59529184 | 30.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS60212152 | 24.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US59529184 | 30.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4612933 | 23.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US59529184 | 30.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA851916 | 27.11.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | US59529184 | 30.03.1984 |