EP0163598 - Herbicidal compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eberle, Dieter, Dr. Girenhaldenweg 10 CH-4126 Bettingen / CH | 02 /
Langauer, Theodor, Dr. Obrechtstrasse 4 CH-4132 Muttenz / CH | [1985/49] | Application number, filing date | 85810179.3 | 22.04.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | CH19840002060 | 27.04.1984 Original published format: CH 206084 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163598 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163598 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
A01N47/30 (EP);
A01N25/04 (EP);
A01N47/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/30, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/49] | Title | German: | Herbizide Zusammensetzungen | [1985/49] | English: | Herbicidal compositions | [1985/49] | French: | Compositions herbicides | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0017879 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE3210869 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0073727 (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]); | [A]EP0088049 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0102003 (SIPCAM SPA [IT]) |