Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] |
19.08.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.10.1989 [1989/40] |
22.01.1988 | First examination report | |
04.10.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] |
04.10.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] |