Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU578280B | Global Dossier | 20.10.1988 | B2 | AU4170185 | 31.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0163598 | Global Dossier | 04.10.1989 | B1 | EP0163598 | 04.12.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR247066 | 30.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1247880 | 03.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS253726 | 17.12.1987 | B2 | CS301285 | 14.05.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD236446 | 11.06.1986 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3573368D1 | 09.11.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU199063 | 29.01.1990 | B | HUT39331 | 29.09.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL75008 | 15.05.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0553764B | 10.08.1993 | B2 | JPS60233003 | 19.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ211913 | 06.01.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH22178 | 28.06.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO90826 | 30.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR22343 | 20.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA853134 | 26.02.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | CH206084 | 27.04.1984 |