EP0165900 - Lactones, their preparation and their use as herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burckhardt, Urs, Dr. Rittergasse 29 CH-4051 Basel / CH | [1985/52] | Application number, filing date | 85810255.1 | 03.06.1985 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | CH19840002808 | 08.06.1984 Original published format: CH 280884 | [1985/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165900 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165900 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/22, A01N43/16, // (C07D493/22, 313:00, 311:00, 307:00) | [1985/52] | CPC: |
C07H19/01 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61P33/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/52] | Title | German: | Neue Lactone, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in der Schädlingsbekämpfung | [1985/52] | English: | Lactones, their preparation and their use as herbicides | [1985/52] | French: | Lactones, leur méthode de préparation et leur utilisation comme herbicide | [1985/52] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 05.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 19.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, Oktober 1980, Seiten 1120-1127; YO TAKIGUCHI et al.: "Milbemycins, a new family of macrolide antibiotics: fermentation, isolation and physico-chemical properties" |