Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
20.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] |
11.02.1988 | First examination report | |
08.10.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.1986 [1986/48] |
14.02.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.04.1986 [1986/14] |