Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU569804B | Global Dossier | 18.02.1988 | B2 | AU4713585 | 20.03.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0176476 | Global Dossier | 02.04.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1231516 | 19.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8706574 | 01.07.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8801608 | 16.02.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6172624 | 14.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO853564L | 17.03.1986 | L | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4637908 | 20.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA856781 | 30.04.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | CH441084 | 14.09.1984 |