EP0180541 - Method and device for cleaning a printing form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Schneebeli & Co.AG Schaffhauserstrasse 307 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | [1986/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneebeli, Hanspeter Herzogenmühlestrasse 14 CH-8051 Zürich / CH | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy Pauline, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy P., Dipl.-Chem., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85810469.8 | 14.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | CH19840005241 | 31.10.1984 Original published format: CH 524184 | [1986/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180541 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180541 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/02 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
B41F35/001 (EP);
B41F35/02 (EP);
B41P2235/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Reinigen einer Druckform | [1986/19] | English: | Method and device for cleaning a printing form | [1986/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de nettoyage d'une forme d'impression | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 01.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB326588 (HERMANN HAHN, et al); | [X]FR1012324 (TRAITEMENT INTERNE DES CHAUDIE); | [Y]FR1146383 ; | [X]FR1249140 ; | [X]US3656493 (BLACK JAMES A, et al); | [X]FR2288616 (TIFLEX ETS [FR]); | [A]FR2293252 (BENHAIM ALBERT [FR]); | [Y]GB2003840 (WOMA MAASBERG CO GMBH W) |