EP0185615 - Process for making a fibre optic cable, cable obtained by the process and apparatus for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia-Maillefer S.A. Route du Bois 1024 Ecublens Canton de Vaud / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states Nokia-Maillefer S.A. Route du Bois CH-1024 Ecublens Canton de Vaud / CH | ||
Former [1986/26] | For all designated states Maillefer S.A. Route du Bois CH-1024 Ecublens Canton de Vaud / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlaeppi, René Chemin des Charmilles 4 CH-1008 Prilly / CH | 02 /
Bruggmann, Rémy La Treille CH-1817 Brent / CH | [1986/26] | Representative(s) | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard SA., Ingénieurs-Conseils, Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard SA., Ingénieurs-Conseils, Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | ||
Former [1986/26] | Rochat, Daniel Jean Bovard SA Ingénieurs-Conseils ACP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 85810574.5 | 04.12.1985 | [1986/26] | Priority number, date | CH19840005966 | 14.12.1984 Original published format: CH 596684 | [1986/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0185615 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0185615 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185615 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/03, C03B37/12, G02B6/44 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/4484 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
G02B6/4479 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/26] | C03B37/03, C03B37/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optischen Faserkabels, das nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Kabel und Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | [1986/26] | English: | Process for making a fibre optic cable, cable obtained by the process and apparatus for carrying out the process | [1986/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément de câblage à fibre optique, élément de câblage obtenu par ce procédé et installation pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1986/26] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 16.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1992
03.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | [1992/33] | 10.08.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.12.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.05.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.11.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/07] | Appeal following opposition | 12.08.1993 | Appeal received No. T0742/93 | 13.10.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/31] | CH | 09.10.1991 | |
LI | 09.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4154783 (JACKSON LYNDEN A [GB]); | [A]GB2013927 (TELEPHONE CABLES LTD); | [X]GB2017335 (BICC LTD); | [A]GB2079970 (BICC LTD); | [A]DE3239024 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2547067 (NOKIA OY AB [FI]) |