EP0161225 - A device for maintaining a constant oil level [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martinelli, Giuseppe Via F.lli Rosselli, 21/3 I-20100 Milano / IT | [1985/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/46] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85830109.6 | 08.05.1985 | [1985/46] | Priority number, date | IT19840020884 | 11.05.1984 Original published format: IT 2088484 | [1985/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161225 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161225 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161225 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/04, F16N19/00 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
G05D9/02 (EP,US);
F01M11/0408 (EP,US);
F01M11/061 (EP,US);
F16N19/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufrechterhaltung eines Schmiermittelpegels | [1985/46] | English: | A device for maintaining a constant oil level | [1985/46] | French: | Dispositif pour maintenir un niveau d'huile constant | [1985/46] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 09.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.1990 | BE | 07.02.1990 | CH | 07.02.1990 | FR | 07.02.1990 | LI | 07.02.1990 | NL | 07.02.1990 | SE | 07.02.1990 | GB | 08.05.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1991/30] | AT | 07.02.1990 | |
BE | 07.02.1990 | ||
CH | 07.02.1990 | ||
LI | 07.02.1990 | ||
NL | 07.02.1990 | ||
SE | 07.02.1990 | ||
GB | 08.05.1990 | ||
FR | 29.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/26] | AT | 07.02.1990 | |
BE | 07.02.1990 | ||
CH | 07.02.1990 | ||
LI | 07.02.1990 | ||
NL | 07.02.1990 | ||
SE | 07.02.1990 | ||
FR | 29.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | AT | 07.02.1990 | |
BE | 07.02.1990 | ||
CH | 07.02.1990 | ||
LI | 07.02.1990 | ||
NL | 07.02.1990 | ||
SE | 07.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 07.02.1990 | |
CH | 07.02.1990 | ||
LI | 07.02.1990 | ||
NL | 07.02.1990 | ||
SE | 07.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | CH | 07.02.1990 | |
LI | 07.02.1990 | ||
NL | 07.02.1990 | ||
SE | 07.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/45] | CH | 07.02.1990 | |
LI | 07.02.1990 | ||
NL | 07.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/44] | NL | 07.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR3079E (JULES BOUCLY [FR]); | [A]FR541349 ; | [X]US1632215 (BORBECK ROBERT E, et al); | [X]US2283303 (WHITLOCK STEWART B); | [X]FR2522066 (CRAF [FR]) |