EP0169179 - Procedure for making an electric battery housing or casing, and battery housing or casing obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACCUMA S.p.A. Via Medici 14 I-20052 Monza / IT | [1986/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pigatto, Edro Via Borgese, 4 Milano / IT | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Caregaro, Silvio, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Caregaro, Silvio, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85830184.9 | 17.07.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | IT19840021969 | 19.07.1984 Original published format: IT 2196984 | [1986/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169179 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
H01M50/10 (EP,US);
H01M50/103 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/04] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines Batteriekastens oder -gehäuses und dadurch erzeugter Batteriekasten oder -gehäuse | [1986/04] | English: | Procedure for making an electric battery housing or casing, and battery housing or casing obtained thereby | [1986/04] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une boîte ou bac pour batterie électrique et boîte ou bac pour batterie ainsi obtenue | [1986/04] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 09.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 19.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/04] | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1448994 (FULMEN); | [Y]FR2007909 (GOULD NATIONAL BATTERIES INC); | [Y]DE1596186 (NIRONA WERKE KG); | [X]GB1378655 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [X]US4460663 (STUTZBACH RONALD J [US], et al) |