EP0215996 - Apparatus for overturning and feeding strips of staples forming them in groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITALPUNTI MACCHINE S.N.C. DI SARTI FRANCO & C. Via Calari, 18 40069 Zola Predosa Bo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states ITALPUNTI MACCHINE S.N.C. DI SARTI FRANCO & C. Via Calari, 18 I-40069 Zola Predosa Bo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarti, Franco Via del Vivaio 17/2 I-40132 Bologna / IT | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19 I-40121 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 85830245.8 | 27.09.1985 | [1987/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215996 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215996 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/18, B65G57/081, B65B5/10 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
B65B5/106 (EP);
B65G57/081 (EP);
B65G57/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Wenden und Zuführen von Strips von Nieten zur Gruppenbildung | [1987/14] | English: | Apparatus for overturning and feeding strips of staples forming them in groups | [1987/14] | French: | Appareil de renversement et d'alimentation de bandes d'agrafes pour la formation de groupes | [1987/14] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 01.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 28.06.1989 | FR | 28.06.1989 | LI | 28.06.1989 | GB | 27.09.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1990/42] | CH | 28.06.1989 | |
LI | 28.06.1989 | ||
GB | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/17] | CH | 28.06.1989 | |
LI | 28.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2124221 ; | [A]GB1125385 ; | [A]FR1269904 |