EP0221224 - A press for the production of pieces requiring for their industrial processing a preforming step with low expenditure of forces and a final high pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANTEGANI ENZO Via Clusone, 2 I-20135 Milan / IT | [1987/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | La Ciura, Salvatore Via Francesco Sforza 3 20122 Milano / IT | [2010/01] |
Former [1987/20] | La Ciura, Salvatore c/o STUDIO D'ORIO Via F. Sforza, 3 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85830252.4 | 08.10.1985 | [1987/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221224 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/00, B30B11/10, B28B5/08, B28B5/04 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
B28B13/0215 (EP);
B28B3/003 (EP);
B28B5/04 (EP);
B28B5/08 (EP);
B30B11/001 (EP);
B30B11/10 (EP);
B30B15/302 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/20] | Title | German: | Presse zum Herstellen von Gegenständen, deren Serienfertigung eine Vorformung mit geringem Kraftaufwand une einem hohen Enddruck erfordert | [1987/20] | English: | A press for the production of pieces requiring for their industrial processing a preforming step with low expenditure of forces and a final high pressure | [1987/20] | French: | Presse pour l'obtention d'objets exigeant pour leur fabrication industrielle, une étape de préformage avec faible dépense d'effort, et une pression finale élevée | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 17.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/27] | 09.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.11.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR63296E ; | [Y]DE126374 ; | [A]FR2475971 ; | [A]DE194739 ; | [A]DE441515 ; | [A]FR1402317 ; | [A]DE2630355 ; | [A]DE1604492 ; | [A]US2409221 ; | [A]GB2064417 |