EP0157751 - Thermally insulated container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lejondahl, Lars-Erik Harkulesgatan 15 S-641 34 Katrineholm / SE | [1985/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlsson, Björn G. Boställsgatan 54 D-583 31 Linköping / SE | 02 /
Björk, Curt Konsistoriegatan 21 B S-582 34 Linköping / SE | 03 /
Lejondahl, Lars-Erik Herkulesgatan 15 S-641 34 Katrineholm / SE | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005 S-402 21 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 85850116.6 | 01.04.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | SE19840001805 | 02.04.1984 Original published format: SE 8401805 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157751 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157751 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157751 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38, F25D3/08 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
B65D81/3823 (EP);
F25D2303/0831 (EP);
F25D2331/804 (EP);
F25D3/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/41] | B65D81/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Behälter mit Wärmeisolierung | [1985/41] | English: | Thermally insulated container | [1985/41] | French: | Récipient isotherme | [1985/41] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 05.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.08.1989 | LU | 30.04.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1990/19] | SE | 30.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR363819 (LEON EMILE JOSEPH MOYER [FR]); | [A]US2647653 (DUBE JOHN B); | [A]FR57964E (OSSAU BEARN SOC); | [A]US3810367 (PETERSON W); | [A]DE2411960 (PLATMANUFAKTUR AB); | [A]DE2808748 (HJERTSTRAND AAKE WILHELM); | [A]US4294079 (BENSON ERNEST J); | [A]DE3212529 (KAETHER JUERGEN); | [A]WO8304089 (CAMPBELL JUNE H [US]); | [A]EP0132145 (NETWORK MEDICAL CONTAINERS PTY [AU]) |