EP0165915 - Peripheral interface system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cray Research, Inc. Highway 178 North Industrial Park Chippewa Falls Wisconsin 54729 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | For all designated states CRAY RESEARCH, INC. Highway 178 North Industrial Park Chippewa Falls Wisconsin 54729 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halford, Robert James Rural Rt. 8 Box 30R Chippewa Falls Wisconsin 54729 / US | [1985/52] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 85850168.7 | 13.05.1985 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | US19840622786 | 21.06.1984 Original published format: US 622786 | [1985/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165915 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165915 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165915 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/12, G06F13/28 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
G06F13/122 (EP,US);
G06F13/124 (EP,US);
G06F13/28 (EP,US);
G06F13/4022 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/52] | G06F13/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/52] | Title | German: | Peripheres Interface-System | [1994/34] | English: | Peripheral interface system | [1985/52] | French: | Système d'interface périphérique | [1985/52] |
Former [1985/52] | Peripherisches Interface-System | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.1994 | BE | 24.08.1994 | CH | 24.08.1994 | IT | 24.08.1994 | LI | 24.08.1994 | NL | 24.08.1994 | SE | 24.11.1994 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
IT | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 24.08.1994 | |
LI | 24.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2260141 (HONEYWELL BULL SOC IND [FR]); | [A]US4115854 (CAPOWSKI ROBERT S, et al); | [A]EP0071782 (IBM [US]); | [Y]EP0125561 (IBM [US]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 7, December 1978, pages 2723-2724, New York, US; R.L. HESTER et al.: "Multiwiper controller for time-multiplexed channel hardware" | [A] - REVIEW OF THE ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION LABORATORIES, vol. 21, nos. 3-4, March/April 1973, pages 165-173; M. YAMADA et al.: "DIPS I/O interface and DIPS-1 data channel" |