EP0155256 - Railway carriage with a heating and air conditioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.04.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALEX. FRIEDMANN KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT Am Tabor 6 A-1200 Wien / AT | [1985/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paradeiser, Josef Bahnzeile 34 A-2103 Langenzersdorf / AT | 02 /
Juhasz, Heribert, Dipl.-Ing. Holzmeistergasse 13/1/21 A-1210 Wien / AT | [1989/12] |
Former [1985/43] | 01 /
Paradeiser, Josef Bahnzeile 34 A-1210 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
Juhasz, Heribert, Dipl.-Ing. Holzmeistergasse 13/1/21 A-1210 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1985/38] | 01 /
Ertl, Herbert Maxwellgasse 5/80/3 A-1210 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
Juhasz, Heribert, Dipl.-Ing. Holzmeistergasse 13/1/21 A-1210 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/40] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/38] | Krause, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 200 Singerstrasse 8 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 85890020.2 | 29.01.1985 | [1985/38] | Priority number, date | AT19840000881 | 15.03.1984 Original published format: AT 88184 | AT19840002380 | 23.07.1984 Original published format: AT 238084 | [1985/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155256 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155256 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155256 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B61D27/00, F24F3/044 | [1985/38] | CPC: |
B61D27/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1985/38] | Title | German: | Eisenbahnwaggon mit Heiz- bzw. Klimaanlage | [1985/38] | English: | Railway carriage with a heating and air conditioning device | [1985/38] | French: | Voiture de chemin de fer avec dispositif de chauffage et de climatisation | [1985/38] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.1989
19.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Asea Brown Boveri AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Rupprecht, Klaus c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | 02
21.12.1989
04.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Linke-Hofmann-Busch Waggon-Fahrzeug-Maschinen GmbH Gottfried-Linke-Strasse Postfach 41 11 60 D-3320 Salzgitter 41 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.1989
19.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Asea Brown Boveri AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Rupprecht, Klaus c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
02
21.12.1989
04.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Linke-Hofmann-Busch Waggon-Fahrzeug-Maschinen GmbH Gottfried-Linke-Strasse Postfach 41 11 60 D-3320 Salzgitter 41 / DE | |||
Former [1990/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.12.1989
19.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Asea Brown Boveri AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE Opponent's representative Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
02
21.12.1989
04.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Linke-Hofmann-Busch Waggon-Fahrzeug-Maschinen GmbH Gottfried-Linke-Strasse Postfach 41 11 60 D-3320 Salzgitter 41 / DE | 23.01.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.05.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.05.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.01.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.01.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT355618B [ ]; | DE2055614 [ ]; | AT314595B [ ] |