EP0181855 - Toy building system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.05.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1989 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.1989 [1989/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastny, Michael Speisinger Strasse 155 A-1238 Wien / AT | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Erwin, et al Patentanwälte Müllner, Katschinka, Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 A-1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1986/21] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 85890272.9 | 31.10.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | AT19840003462 | 31.10.1984 Original published format: AT 346284 | [1986/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181855 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/08 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
A63H33/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/21] | Title | German: | Baukastensystem | [1986/21] | English: | Toy building system | [1986/21] | French: | Système de jeu de construction | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 22.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/25] | 31.12.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE880571 ; | [Y]CH486898 ; | [Y]CH463355 ; | [AD]GB908097 ; | [AD]WO8303058 ; | [A]US3374917 |