EP0185011 - Tool holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK HEID AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ernstbrunner Strasse 31-33 A-2000 Stockerau / AT | [1986/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steiner, Karl Neulerchenfelderstrasse 11/9 A-1160 Wien / AT | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Erwin, et al Patentanwälte Müllner, Katschinka, Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 A-1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1986/25] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Postfach 159 Weihburggasse 9 A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 85890306.5 | 10.12.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | AT19840003913 | 10.12.1984 Original published format: AT 391384 | [1986/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0185011 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0185011 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185011 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23B3/16, B23B3/06 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
B23B3/162 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5154 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5155 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2502 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | B23B3/16, B23B3/06 | ||
Former IPC [1986/25] | B23B3/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/25] | Title | German: | Werkzeugträger | [1986/25] | English: | Tool holder | [1986/25] | French: | Porte-outil | [1986/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.07.1990 | SE | 25.07.1990 | CH | 31.12.1990 | LI | 31.12.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/05] | SE | 25.07.1990 | |
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 25.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3410276 (WOHLENBERG KG H [DE]); | [A]DE1602902 (FRORIEP GMBH MASCHF); | [A]DE3244084 (HEYLIGENSTAEDT & CO [DE]); | [A]DE2637792 (HASSE & WREDE GMBH) | [Y] - WERKSTATT UND BETRIEB, Band 111, Nr. 8, August 1978, Seiten 501-504, München; W. KALMBACH "CNC-Drehmaschine als Bearbeitungszentrum" | [A] - V.D.I.-ZEITSCHRIFT, Band 125, Nr. 22, November 1983, Seiten 107-111, Düsseldorf; E. KELLERHALS et al.: "Komplettbearbeitung auf CNC-Drehmaschinen mit angetriebenen Werkzeugen" | [A] - WERKSTATT UND BETRIEB, Band 117, Nr. 8, August 1984, Seiten 493-498, München; M. HEKELER "Komplettbearbeitung auf CNC-Drehmaschinen durch angetriebene Werkzeuge" | [A] - V.D.I.-ZEITSCHRIFT, Band 125, Nr. 8, April 1983, Seiten 283-286, Düsseldorf; M. SCHULER "Möglichkeiten des Einsatzes von Messeinrichtungen an CNC-Drehmaschinen" |