EP0163705 - SAFETY TIMER FOR TELEVISION SETS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1986 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neumeier, Robert Weissachaustrasse 21 D-8183 Rottach-Egern / DE | [1985/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85900052.3 | 30.11.1984 | [1985/50] | WO1984DE00259 | Priority number, date | DE19833343243 | 30.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3343243 | [1985/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502488 | Date: | 06.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163705 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01H43/02 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
H01H43/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1985/50] | Title | German: | KINDERSICHERE SCHALTUHR FÜR FERNSEHGERÄTE ODER DGL. | [1985/50] | English: | SAFETY TIMER FOR TELEVISION SETS OR THE LIKE | [1985/50] | French: | MINUTERIE DE SECURITE POUR APPAREIL DE TELEVISION OU AUTRES | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 16.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/23] | 29.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.12.1985 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4246495 [ ] (PRESSMAN JEROME); | DE2812267 [ ] (SCHWENK KG THEBEN WERK); | FR2205725 [ ] (DIELA STE EXPL ETS [FR]) |