EP0165320 - DISK-SHAPED RECORDING MEDIUM AND APPARATUS FOR REPRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Shoichi Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Tadao Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1985/52] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85900170.3 | 30.11.1984 | [1985/52] | WO1984JP00570 | Priority number, date | JP19830226598 | 30.11.1983 Original published format: JP 22659883 | [1985/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502481 | Date: | 06.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0165320 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165320 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B20/00, G11B20/10, G11B23/36 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1254 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/013 (EP,US);
H04N5/9203 (EP,US);
H04N5/9208 (EP,US);
H04N5/9267 (EP,US);
H04N5/9305 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10546 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/52] | Title | German: | PLATTENFÖRMIGES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERGABE | [1985/52] | English: | DISK-SHAPED RECORDING MEDIUM AND APPARATUS FOR REPRODUCING THE SAME | [1985/52] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT EN FORME DE DISQUE ET SON APPAREIL DE REPRODUCTION | [1985/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.1985 | Translation filed | 25.07.1985 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1985 | Search fee paid | 25.07.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP60119671 ; | [A]EP0084777 (DISCOVISION ASS [US]); | [AE]EP0137855 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 276 (P-402)[1999], 2nd November 1985; & JP-A-60 119 671 (SONY K.K.) 27-06-1985, & JP60119671 A 00000000 | International search | [A]JPS5864603 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS58133690 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS58137138 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [P]JPS5968806 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [P]JPS5977686 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [P]JPS59198537 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |