EP0202221 - METHOD AND MEANS TO PUMP A WELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.08.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1990 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WATTS, John, Dawson Suite 105, 10700 N.W. Freeway Houston, TX 77092 / US | [1986/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | ||
Former [1986/48] | Lainé, Simon James Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85900329.5 | 23.11.1984 | [1986/48] | WO1984US01935 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603250 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202221 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/12, E21B43/34, E21B43/02, F04B17/00, F04B35/00 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
F04B47/08 (EP,US);
E21B43/129 (EP,US);
E21B43/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, NL [1987/23] |
Former [1986/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PUMPEN EINES BOHRLOCHES | [1986/48] | English: | METHOD AND MEANS TO PUMP A WELL | [1986/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE POMPAGE D'UN PUITS | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1986 | Search fee paid | 14.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 16.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DE, LU, SE | 13.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/42] | 02.06.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/42] | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1988 | 30.11.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.1989 | 01.12.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1461446 [ ] (BOEING CO, et al); | US4019575 [ ] (PISIO PETER, et al); | US4233154 [ ] (PRESLEY CHARLES L); | US4446917 [ ] (TODD JOHN C [US]) | International search | [A]US2029323 (DAVID JONES); | [A]US2258614 (KENDRICK JOHN F); | [Y]US2942552 (WAYT NEWELL E); | [Y]US3106526 (SCHMIDT BENJAMIN F); | [Y]US3540814 (ROEDER GEORGE K); | [Y]US3797203 (MURDOCK F); | [Y]US3893918 (FAVRET JR UNCAS); | [Y]US4011906 (ALEXANDER HARVEY C, et al); | [Y]US4026661 (ROEDER GEORGE K); | [Y]US4125289 (HUFF RAY V, et al); | [Y]US4272383 (MCGREW JAY L); | [Y]US4285401 (ERICKSON JOHN W); | [Y]US4407306 (HIBBITTS CHARLES H [US]); | [Y]US4425239 (JACOCKS CLAUD L [US], et al); | [Y]US4436148 (MAXWELL RICHARD [US]) |