EP0202222 - TISSUE RE-CALCIFICATION PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.1987 [1987/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAWRUK, Stephen, D. 11 High Street Nutley, NJ 07110 / US | [1986/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/48] | Application number, filing date | 85900341.0 | 27.11.1984 | [1986/48] | WO1984US01948 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603121 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202222 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
A61K33/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/00, A61K31/19 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/48] | Title | German: | GEWEBE-WIEDERKALZIFIZIERUNGSERZEUGNIS | [1986/48] | English: | TISSUE RE-CALCIFICATION PRODUCT | [1986/48] | French: | PRODUIT DE RECALCIFICATION DES TISSUS | [1986/48] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/24] | 22.12.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.08.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 28.08.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.12.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4259315 ; | [X]US1513298 |