EP0168423 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Stewart 133 Annursnac Hill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85900413.7 | 13.12.1984 | [1986/04] | WO1984US02039 | Priority number, date | US19830564753 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: US 564753 | [1986/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502914 | Date: | 04.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168423 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168423 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
G02F1/1335 (EP,US);
G02F1/133305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/04] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALL-ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [1986/04] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [1986/04] | French: | AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [1986/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1985 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 13.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP5891428 ; | DE3127347 [ ] (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]); | EP0089493 [ ] (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | GB2119110 [ ] (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | DE2313730 [ ]; | DE3137518 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | US3736047 [ ] (GELBER R M, et al); | US4166871 [ ] (SCHULER NORMAN W [US]); | US2445555 [ ] (BINDA FREDERICK J); | EP0025457 [ ] (RICOH KK [JP]); | DE2422784 [ ] (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 192, published 23 August 1983, page (P-218) (1337); & JP, A, 5891428 (Nitto Denki Kogyo K.K.) 5 May 1983 see the Abstract, & JP5891428 A 19830505 |