EP0165976 - Method for preparing a composite sheet or for paper coating using stable latexes having phosphorous-containing surface groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/01] | STABLE LATEXES HAVING PHOSPHORUS-CONTAINING SURFACE GROUPS | ||
[1991/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENE, Bettye, W. 5213 Cortland Street Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Sun-Lin 2204 Dilloway Street Midland, MI 48640 / US | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85900421.0 | 13.12.1984 | [1986/01] | WO1984US02052 | Priority number, date | US19830562886 | 19.12.1983 Original published format: US 562886 | US19840659735 | 11.10.1984 Original published format: US 659735 | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502857 | Date: | 04.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0165976 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165976 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/20, C08K5/49, C08F2/00, D21H19/16 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
D21H17/42 (EP,US);
C08F2/24 (EP,US);
D21H19/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/01] | C08K3/20, C08K5/49, C08F2/00, D21D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung von Flächengebilden oder zur Beschichtung von Papier unter Verwendung von stabilen Latices mit phosphorhaltigen Oberflächengruppen | [1991/04] | English: | Method for preparing a composite sheet or for paper coating using stable latexes having phosphorous-containing surface groups | [1991/04] | French: | Méthode de préparation de feuilles composées ou d'enduisage de papier en utilisant des latex stables possédant des groupes de surface contenant du phosphore | [1991/04] |
Former [1986/01] | STABILE LATICES MIT PHOSPHORHALTIGEN OBERFLÄCHENGRUPPEN | ||
Former [1986/01] | STABLE LATEXES HAVING PHOSPHORUS-CONTAINING SURFACE GROUPS | ||
Former [1986/01] | LATEX STABLES POSSEDANT DES GROUPES DE SURFACE CONTENANT DU PHOSPHORE | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1985 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.1985 | Search fee paid | 07.08.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1985 | Examination requested [1986/01] | 17.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4233198 (NOELKEN ERNST); | [X]US4110285 (PONS DICK A, et al); | [X]US3963688 (LORENZ DONALD H, et al); | [A]US3887656 (SHIM KYUNG S); | [A]US3701816 (NOGAMI SUMITAKA, et al); | [Y]US3449282 (LASHER NATHAN, et al); | [A]US3433759 (BAYERL JOSEPH JAMES, et al); | [Y]US3259601 (PROTZEK WILLIAM L, et al); | [X]US2853471 (BEADELL DONALD A); | [Y]US4225383 (MCREYNOLDS KENT B) | [Y] - McCUTCHEON'S Emulsifiers & Detergents 1982 International Edition page 168 |