EP0169852 - HEADRAIL HARDWARE FOR HANGING WINDOW COVERINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL CLUTCH CORP. 1501 Broadway New York, NY 10036 / US | [1986/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDE, Edward, T. 92 Woodside Circle Fairfield, CT 06432 / US | 02 /
NISENSON, Jules 143 Hoyt Street Stamford, CT 06905 / US | 03 /
WAINE, Martin 29 Coventry Lane Riverside, CT 06878 / US | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Godwin, Edgar James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85900425.1 | 14.12.1984 | [1986/06] | WO1984US02063 | Priority number, date | US19830565709 | 27.12.1983 Original published format: US 565709 | [1986/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502760 | Date: | 04.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169852 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.07.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169852 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.07.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A47G5/02, A47H3/00 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
E06B9/17 (EP,US);
E06B9/322 (EP,US);
E06B9/64 (EP,US);
E06B2009/3225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/06] | Title | German: | AUFHÄNGESCHIENE FÜR FENSTERVORHÄNGE | [1986/06] | English: | HEADRAIL HARDWARE FOR HANGING WINDOW COVERINGS | [1986/06] | French: | AXE DE SUSPENSION POUR STORES DE FENETRE | [1986/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1985 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1985 | Search fee paid | 27.08.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1509779 (ROECKER KURT); | [A]GB931344 (HUNTER DOUGLAS INTERNATIONAL) | International search | [Y]US1068306 (BOUGHTON ALLYN [US]); | [Y]US1342527 (JOHN CAHILL); | [Y]US1848742 ; | [Y]US1894833 (RUBY WILLIAM H, et al); | [Y]US2250106 (LORENTZEN HANS K); | [Y]US2520629 (JOHN ESPOSITO); | [A]US3246685 (ANDERSON JAMES A, et al); | [Y]US3352349 (HENNEQUIN PETRUS J); | [A]US3487875 (SHUKAT HARRY, et al); | [X]GB986529 (HUNTER DOUGLAS INT QUEBEC LTD) |