EP0175700 - BRACELET FOR THE JEWELLERY AND WATCH MAKING INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSCHANZ, Pierre Neuwis 25 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | For all designated states HAGMANN, Jean-Pierre Rue Comte-Géraud5 CH-1213 Onex / CH | [1986/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Siebert, Rolf PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R.A. MASPOLI Witikon - Zentrum Postfach 191 8053 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Siebert, Rolf, Dipl.-Masch.Ing.ETH p.A. PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R.A. MASPOLI Postfach 191 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85900623.1 | 11.02.1985 | [1986/14] | WO1985CH00023 | Priority number, date | CH19840000671 | 13.02.1984 Original published format: CH 67184 | [1986/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503417 | Date: | 15.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0175700 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175700 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/10 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
A44C5/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/14] | Title | German: | UHRARMBAND ODER SCHMUCKARMBAND | [1986/14] | English: | BRACELET FOR THE JEWELLERY AND WATCH MAKING INDUSTRY | [1986/14] | French: | BRACELET POUR HORLOGERIE OU BIJOUTERIE | [1986/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1985 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 13.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US1476462 [ ] (JOSEF PEJCHAR); | FR1228216 [ ] (GEORGES LENFANT); | DE1460162 [ ] (DREXLER OSKAR); | FR2040032 [ ] (WILM RENATUS) |