EP0203921 - HOSE CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABA of Sweden AB Scheelegatan 28 S-112 28 Stockholm / SE | [1987/25] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states ALLMÄNNA BRANDREDSKAPSAFFÄREN AB ABA-BOLAGEN Schéelegatan 28 S-112 28 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBRANT, Sven Röhällvägen S-386 00 Färjestaden / SE | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Ferkinghoff, Claes-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | Ferkinghoff, Claes-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 85900811.2 | 29.01.1985 | [1986/50] | WO1985SE00034 | Priority number, date | SE19840000435 | 30.01.1984 Original published format: SE 8400435 | [1986/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503336 | Date: | 01.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203921 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203921 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/08 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
F16L33/08 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1427 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1441 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1449 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/50] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHKLAMMER | [1986/50] | English: | HOSE CLAMP | [1986/50] | French: | BRIDE DE FIXATION POUR TUYAU | [1986/50] | File destroyed: | 12.07.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1985 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 23.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 05.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1188207 (SOPAL SOC); | [Y]CH405027 (OETIKER HANS [CH]); | [A]DE2240271 (JURID WERKE GMBH); | [Y]SE415920 (LARSSON SVEN BERTIL, et al); | [A]US4308648 (FAY ROBERT F); | [Y]DE3130092 (TRIDON SERFLEX SA [FR]); | [A]DE3246542 (COMMUNICATIONS TECH CORP [US]) | Examination | SE79097465 |