EP0173706 - PROFILED SHEET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILSON DOUBLE-DECK TRAILERS LIMITED Culcavey Hillsborough Lisburn Co. Antrim Northern Ireland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states WILSON DOUBLE-DECK TRAILERS LIMITED Culcavey Hillsborough Lisburn Co. Antrim Northern Ireland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Frederick, George 49 Hillsborough Old Road Lisburn County Antrim BT26 6HN / GB | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901033.2 | 25.02.1985 | [1986/11] | WO1985GB00075 | Priority number, date | GB19840004977 | 25.02.1984 Original published format: GB 8404977 | GB19840025915 | 13.10.1984 Original published format: GB 8425915 | [1986/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503679 | Date: | 29.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173706 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173706 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/00, F16S1/06 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
B62D33/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/30] |
Former [1986/11] | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | PROFILIERTES PLATTENMATERIAL | [1986/11] | English: | PROFILED SHEET MATERIAL | [1986/11] | French: | MATERIAU PROFILE EN FEUILLES | [1986/11] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1987/15: Verbunden mit 85301263.1/0156519 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 13.02.87 | EPB 1987/15: Consolidated with 85301263.1/0156519 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 13.02.87 | EPB 1987/15: Jointe à la demande no. 85301263.1/0156519 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 13.02.87 | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.1985 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 08.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Request for further processing for: | 18.11.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB1333453 [ ] (NAYLOR D C); | DE1481698 [ ] (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE); | DE1975606U [ ] (WACKENHUT ERNST [DE]); | DE8200019U [ ]; | DE6932746U [ ] (BLUMHARDT OHG FAHRZEUGWERK GEB [DE]); | US3028192 [ ] (JEWELL ROBERT A); | US3583123 [ ] (HOLMGREN ROBERT E, et al) |