EP0177554 - REMOTE SUBSCRIBER INTERACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.11.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1989 | Refusal of application | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMES, Rolland T 103 Linden Avenue Collingswood NJ 08108 / US | For all designated states CHEBRA, Ronald J. 22 Deacon Drive Mercerville NJ 08619 / US | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/16] | Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85901736.0 | 12.03.1985 | [1986/16] | WO1985US00406 | Priority number, date | US19840590189 | 16.03.1984 Original published format: US 590189 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504302 | Date: | 26.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177554 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.09.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/04 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
H04M11/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR [1986/16] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIONSSYSTEM FÜR ENTFERNTEN TEILNEHMER | [1986/16] | English: | REMOTE SUBSCRIBER INTERACTION SYSTEM | [1986/16] | French: | SYSTEME D'INTERACTION D'ABONNE A DISTANCE | [1986/16] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 04.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/52] | 28.01.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed | International search | [A]FR2359554 (MATRA [FR]); | [A]US4162488 (BARLEEN DAVID G [US], et al); | [A]US4258357 (BROWELL LESLIE J); | [A]US4332980 (REYNOLDS CHRISTOPHER C, et al); | [A]US4342986 (BUSKIRK ALLAN F V, et al); | [X]WO8302046 (JAMES ROLLAND T [US], et al); | [P]US4442320 (JAMES ROLLAND T [US], et al) |