EP0210169 - OPTICAL POSITION CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INDUSTRIAL INC. 5960 Heisley Road Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INDUSTRIAL INC. 5960 Heisley Road Mentor, Ohio 44060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELOCIK, Grant, C. 11605 Edgewood Drive Chardon, OH 44024 / US | 02 /
WIBLE, John, E. 201 Briar Hill Drive Painesville, OH 44077 / US | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/06] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85901858.2 | 01.04.1985 | [1987/06] | WO1985US00543 | Priority number, date | US19850693415 | 22.01.1985 Original published format: US 693415 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604317 | Date: | 31.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0210169 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210169 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/24, G01B11/00 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
B66F9/0755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE STEUERUNG DER ORTUNG | [1987/06] | English: | OPTICAL POSITION CONTROLLER | [1987/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE DE COMMANDE DE LA POSITION | [1987/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1986 | Search fee paid | 09.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 24.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3695463 (WEISKER ALEXANDER, et al); | [A]FR2146406 (OEHLER WYHLEN LAGERTECHNIK AG, et al); | [A]FR2495797 (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE) [FR]) | International search | [Y]US3824020 (PEASE L); | [Y]CA708047 (LIPTON PRODUCTS LTD); | [A]US4105339 (WIRTANEN THEODORE E); | [A]GB946074 (CONTINENTAL ELEKTRO IND AG); | [A]US4441817 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]) |