EP0179095 - GAMMA PHOTON DETECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LICHTENSTEIN, Meir 17 Yeneda Street North Balwyn, VIC 3104 / AU | For all designated states JOST, Gregory Mack 19 Astley Court Templestowe, VIC 3106 / AU | [1986/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/18] | Application number, filing date | 85901934.1 | 26.04.1985 | [1986/18] | WO1985AU00094 | Priority number, date | AU19840004713 | 26.04.1984 Original published format: AU 471384 | [1986/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504959 | Date: | 07.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179095 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/20, G01T1/28 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
G01T1/28 (EP);
G01T1/202 (EP);
G01T1/203 (EP);
G01T1/204 (EP);
G01T5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | GAMMAPHOTONNACHWEISVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [1986/18] | English: | GAMMA PHOTON DETECTION APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1986/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE PHOTONS GAMMA | [1986/18] | File destroyed: | 17.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 01.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/52] | 24.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 27.01.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3873838 ; | [A]JPS57104873 ; | [A]WO8303683 |