EP0185693 - PROCESS AND REAGENT FOR TOTAL ENZYMATIC ANALYSIS OF UREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/27] | PROCESS AND REAGENT FOR TOTAL ENZYMATIC ANALYSIS OF URINE | ||
[1988/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | [1986/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEDEL, Joachim Bahnhofstrasse 6 D-8131 Bernried / DE | 02 /
WAHLEFELD, August, Wilhelm Alpenblickstrasse 25 D-8126 Hohenpeissenberg / DE | 03 /
ZIEGENHORN, Joachim Ina-Seidel-Weg 1 D-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85902535.5 | 23.05.1985 | [1986/27] | WO1985EP00250 | Priority number, date | DE19843419642 | 25.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3419642 | [1986/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505641 | Date: | 19.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185693 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185693 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/58, C12N9/02, C12N9/88 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/58 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND REAGENZ ZUR VOLLENZYMATISCHEN BESTIMMUNG VON HARNSTOFF | [1986/27] | English: | PROCESS AND REAGENT FOR TOTAL ENZYMATIC ANALYSIS OF UREA | [1988/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET REACTIF PERMETTANT LA DETERMINATION DE L'UREE PAR ANALYSE ENZYMATIQUE | [1986/27] |
Former [1986/27] | PROCESS AND REAGENT FOR TOTAL ENZYMATIC ANALYSIS OF URINE | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 23.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.03.1988 | NL | 23.03.1988 | SE | 31.03.1988 | [1989/21] |
Former [1989/11] | BE | 23.03.1988 | |
NL | 23.03.1988 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 23.03.1988 | Cited in | International search | DE3247894 [ ] (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 66, No. 10, 6 March 1967, (Columbus, Ohio, US), F. TRIJBELS et al.: "Allantrate and Ureidoglycolate Degradation by Pseudomonas Aeruginosa", see Abstract 43898d, page 4159 & Biochim Biophys Acata 1967 132 (1), 115-26 (Eng.), see the whole document | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 75, No. 13, 27 September 1971, (Columbus, Ohio, US), VAN DER DRIFT et al.: "S-Ureidoglycolate Dehydrogenase. Purification and Properties", see Abstract 84664x, page 43 & Arch. Biochim. Biophys. 1971, 145 (2), 465-9 (Eng.) see the whole document |