EP0182917 - DEVICE FOR PREVENTING COLLISION OF WORK HOLDER WITH TOOL IN NUMERICAL CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TURRET PUNCH PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takao 2-502, Esteto-Hachioji 469-4, Kobiki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85902634.6 | 15.05.1985 | [1986/23] | WO1985JP00269 | Priority number, date | JP19840105521 | 24.05.1984 Original published format: JP 10552184 | [1986/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505298 | Date: | 05.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182917 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182917 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/36, B21D28/04 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
B21D28/12 (EP,US);
G05B19/4061 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45137 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49157 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2506 (EP,US);
Y10T83/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERHINDEREN EINER KOLLISION DES WERKSTÜCKHALTERS MIT DEM WERKZEUG IN EINEM NUMERISCHEN STEUERSYSTEM FÜR EINE REVOLUTIONSPRESSE | [1986/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR PREVENTING COLLISION OF WORK HOLDER WITH TOOL IN NUMERICAL CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TURRET PUNCH PRESS | [1986/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'EMPECHER UNE COLLISION ENTRE LE PORTE-PIECE ET L'OUTIL DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMANDE NUMERIQUE D'UNE PRESSE A DECOUPER A TOURELLE | [1986/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1986 | Translation filed | 07.02.1986 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.1986 | Search fee paid | 07.02.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 08.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2069889 (MERCER NAIRNE & CO LTD) | International search | [Y]JPS51128784 (AMADA LTD US); | [Y]JPS58112103 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JPS59144600 (AMADA CO LTD) |