EP0216769 - AN ARRANGEMENT FOR GRINDING PLANAR ANNULAR SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Handelsbolaget Indumec Gransbovägen 31 S-590 60 LJUNGSBRO / SE | [1988/25] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states LARS-INGE LARSSON MED FIRMA LARSSONS INDUSTRIMEKANISKA VERKSTAD Gransbovägen 31 S-590 60 Ljungsbro / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Lars-Inge Gransbovägen 31 S-590 60 Ljungsbro / SE | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Albihn Willquist AB S:t Larsgatan 23 S-582 24 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 85902693.2 | 03.05.1985 | [1987/15] | WO1985SE00192 | Priority number, date | SE19840002719 | 21.05.1984 Original published format: SE 8402719 | [1987/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8505311 | Date: | 05.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0216769 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0216769 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B24B15/00 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
B24B15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/15] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM SCHLEIFEN PLANARER ANNULARER OBERFLÄCHEN | [1987/15] | English: | AN ARRANGEMENT FOR GRINDING PLANAR ANNULAR SURFACES | [1987/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECTIFICATION DE SURFACES ANNULAIRES PLANES | [1987/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1986 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1985 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 11.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/15] | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Request for further processing for: | 13.02.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE468719 (GEORG SIGUDA); | [A]US2023572 (FERNAND BRENDEL GEORGES); | [A]US2649669 (TOBIS ROBERT A); | [A]US2674069 (BAUER JACOB L) |