EP0218587 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND METHOD OF IMMUNIZING THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states DANA FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLOSSMAN, Stuart, F. One Fox Place Newton Center, MA 02192 / US | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Chikao 329 Great Plain Avenue Needham, MA 02192 / US | 03 /
LETVIN, Norman 36 Brackett Road Newton, MA 02158 / US | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | [1987/17] | Application number, filing date | 85902868.0 | 22.05.1985 | [1987/17] | WO1985US00966 | Priority number, date | US19850703219 | 19.02.1985 Original published format: US 703219 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604782 | Date: | 28.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218587 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218587 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, G01N33/569 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
C07K16/2842 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/17] | A01N1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/17] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER UND IMMUNISIERUNG DAMIT | [1987/17] | English: | MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND METHOD OF IMMUNIZING THEREWITH | [1987/17] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX ET PROCEDE D'IMMUNISATION LES UTILISANT | [1987/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1986 | Search fee paid | 24.09.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 30.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO8505639 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) | International search | [A]US4361550 (KUNG PATRICK C, et al); | [A]US4361549 (KUNG PATRICK C, et al) | [A] - European Journal of Immunology, Volume 12, pages 232-236, issued 1982, ROBIN E. CALLARD et al, Phenotype of Human T Helper and Suppressor Cells in an in Vitro Specific Antibody Response. | [A] - European Surgical Research, Volume 14 (6), pages 447-448, issued 1982, H. BALNER et al, In Vitro and in Vivo Effects in Rhesus Monkeys of Monoclonal Antibodies against Human and Monkey T Cell Subsets. | [A] - European Journal of Immunology, Volume 13, pages 345-347, issued 1983, NORMAN L LETVIN et al, T Lymphocyte Surface Antigens in Primates. | [A] - Clinical Immunology and Immunopathology, Volume 31, pages 96-101, issued 1984, LAURA V. CHALIFOUX et al, Delineation of Lymphocyte Subsets in Lymph Nodes of Non-Human Primates. | [A] - Immunogenetics, Volume 18, pages 599-615, issued 1983, EDWARD A. CLARK et al, Evolution of Epitopes on Human and Nonhuman Primate Lymphocyte Cell Surface Antigens. | [X] - Human Immunology, Volume 7, pages 95-104, issued 1983, BARRY L. POWELL et al, A Monoclonal Antibody Reactive with a Second Epitope of the 67,000-Dalton Human t Cell Antigen. | [A] - Science, Volume 215, page 298-299, issued 15 January 1982, BARTON F. HAYNES et al, Human T Cell Antigen Expression by Primate T Cells. | [A] - Cellular Immunology, Volume 84, pages 163-170, issued 1984, NORMAN L. LETVIN et al, Surface Antigen Changes During B-Lymphocyte Activation in Primates. | [A] - Journal of Immunology, Volume 132, pages 759-765, issued February 1984, PAUL J. MARTIN et al, Epitope Mapping of the Human Surface Suppressor/Cytotoxic T Cell Molecule Tp32. | [X] - Journal of Immunology, Volume 131, pages 180-185, issued July 1983, PAUL J. MARTIN et al, Identification and Functional Characterization of Two Distinct Epitopes on the Human T Cell Surface Protein Tp50. | [A] - Progress in Immunology, Volume 5, pages 1069-1078, issued 1983, STUART F. SCHLOSSMAN et al, Human T Lymphocytes: Their Differentiative History and Functional Program. | Examination | - N, European Journal of Immunology, Vol. 12, Pages 232-236, Issued 1982, Robin E. Callard et al. Phenotype of human T Helper and suppressor Cells in an InVitro Specific Antibody Response | - N, European Surgical Research, Vol. 14(6), pages 447,448, issued 1982, H. Balner et al, In Vitro and In Vivo Effects in Rhesus Monkeys of Monoclonal Antibodies Against Human and Monkey T Cell Subsets. | - N, European Journal of Immunology, Vol.13, pages 345-347, Issued 1983, Norman L Letvin et al., T Lymphocyte Surface Antigens in Primates. | - N, Clinical Immunology and Immunopathology, Vol. 31, Pages 96-101, Issued 1984, Laura V. Chalifoux et al., Delination of Lymphocyte Subsets in Lymph Nodes of Non-Human Primates. | - N, Immunogenetics, Vol 18, Pages 599-615, Issued 1983, Edward A. Clark et al, Evolution of Epitopes on Human and Nonhuman Primate Lyymphocyte Cell Surface Antigens. | - N, human Immunology,Vol. 7, Pages 95-104, Issued 1983, Barry L. Powell et al, A Monoclonal Antibody Reactive with a second Epitope of the 67000-Dalton Human T-Cell Antigen | - N-SCience, Vol. 215, Pages 298-299, Issued 15 January 1982, Barton F. Haynes et al, Human T Cell Antigen Expression by Primates T Cells. | - N, Cellular Immunology, vol. 84, pages 163-170, 1984, Norman L. Letvin et al, Surface Antigen Changes during B-Lymphocyte Activation in Primates. | - N, Journal of Immunology, Volume 132, pages 759-765, Issued february 1984, Paul J. Martin et al, Epitope Mapping of the Human Surface Suppressor/Cytotoxic T Cell Molecule Tp32. | - N, Journal of Immuonology, vol. 131, pages 180-185, July 1983, P.J. Martin et al, Identification of Functional Characterization of Two Distinct Epitopes on the Human T Cell Surface Protein Tp50. |