EP0185061 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING SULFUR-CONTAINING CONTAMINANTS IN SULFONATED HYDROCARBONS, PRODUCTS DERIVED THEREFROM, AND LUBRICANTS AND FUELS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | [1986/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLDEN, Thomas, F. 7729 Ridgeway Drive Mentor, OH 44060 / US | 02 /
BAUMANN, Albert, F. 1036 Oakview Drive Highland Heights, OH 44143 / US | [1986/26] | Representative(s) | Crisp, David Norman, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/26] | Crisp, David Norman, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85902922.5 | 04.06.1985 | [1986/26] | WO1985US01053 | Priority number, date | US19840622921 | 21.06.1984 Original published format: US 622921 | [1986/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600302 | Date: | 16.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185061 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0185061 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C139/14, C10M135/10, C10L1/24 | [1986/26] | CPC: |
C07C303/42 (EP,US);
C10L1/2437 (EP,US);
C10M135/10 (EP,US);
Y10S516/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÄSSIGUNG VON SCHWEFEL ENTHALTENDEN BESUDLERN IN SULFONIERTEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN, DAVON ABGELEITETE ERZEUGNISSE UND SCHMIERMITTEL UND BRENNSTOFFE DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN | [1986/26] | English: | PROCESS FOR REDUCING SULFUR-CONTAINING CONTAMINANTS IN SULFONATED HYDROCARBONS, PRODUCTS DERIVED THEREFROM, AND LUBRICANTS AND FUELS CONTAINING SAME | [1986/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE SUBSTANCES CONTAMINANTES CONTENANT DU SOUFRE DANS DES HYDROCARBURES SULFONES, PRODUITS DERIVES DE CEUX-CI ET LUBRIFIANTS ET CARBURANTS LES CONTENANT | [1986/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1986 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.1988 | [1989/13] | Cited in | International search | GB1277365 [ ] (LABOFINA SA [BE]) |