EP0185734 - POLYBLENDS OF AROMATIC/ISOPROPENYL AROMATIC COPOLYMERS WITH GRAFTED RUBBER CONCENTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEYER, Douglas, E. 5701 Leeway Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
CARRINGTON, Edward, T. 5312 Stony Creek Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903126.2 | 04.06.1985 | [1986/27] | WO1985US01055 | Priority number, date | US19840618178 | 07.06.1984 Original published format: US 618178 | US19850712286 | 15.03.1985 Original published format: US 712286 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600082 | Date: | 03.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0185734 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, C08L27/04, C08L27/10, C08L33/02, C08L33/06, C08L33/26, C08L39/08, C08L47/00, C08L51/04, C08L51/08, C08L53/00 | [1986/27] | CPC: |
C08L25/02 (EP);
C08L25/16 (KR);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/02, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/27] | Title | German: | POLYMISCHUNGEN VON AROMATISCHEN/ISOPROPENYL-AROMATISCHEN KOPOLYMEREN MIT GEENTETEN KAUTSCHUKKONZENTRATEN | [1986/27] | English: | POLYBLENDS OF AROMATIC/ISOPROPENYL AROMATIC COPOLYMERS WITH GRAFTED RUBBER CONCENTRATES | [1986/27] | French: | POLYMELANGES DE COPOLYMERES AROMATIQUES/ISOPROPENYLES AROMATIQUES AVEC CONCENTRES GREFFES DE CAOUTCHOUC | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1986 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1986 | Search fee paid | 23.01.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 09.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/34] | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1223341 (US RUBBER CO) | International search | [X]US4200702 (GAUSEPOHL HERMANN [DE], et al); | [Y]US4277574 (JASTRZEBSKI MICHAEL B, et al) |