EP0219500 - FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIDDE-GRAVINER LIMITED Pentagon House Sir Frank Whittle Road Derby DE2 4EE / GB | [1990/23] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states KIDDE GRAVINER LIMITED Poyle Road Colnbrook Slough Berkshire / GB | ||
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states McCULLOCH, Alister, Leslie 18 Berwick Brae Drive Berwick, VIC 3806 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCulloch, Alister Leslie 18 Berwick Brae Drive Berwick, Victoria 3806 / AU | [1990/14] |
Former [1987/18] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Foster, David Martyn, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Foster, David Martyn, et al MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | ||
Former [1987/18] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903188.2 | 15.07.1985 | [1987/18] | WO1985AU00153 | Priority number, date | AU19840006189 | 24.07.1984 Original published format: AU 618984 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600969 | Date: | 13.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219500 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.02.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/04, A62C3/08, A62C35/12, A62C37/06, A62C37/28 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
A62C35/68 (EP,US);
F16K13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/18] | Title | German: | FEUERSCHUTZSYSTEME | [1987/18] | English: | FIRE PROTECTION SYSTEMS | [1987/18] | French: | SYSTEMES DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES INCENDIES | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/28: Teilanmeldung 90106807.2 eingereicht am 15/07/85 | EPB 1990/28: Divisional application 90106807.2 filed on 15/07/85 | EPB 1990/28: Demande divisionnaire 90106807.2 déposée le 15/07/85 | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.1987 | Search fee paid | 26.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 26.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 01.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/19] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/19] | Divisional application(s) | EP90106807.2 / EP0383368 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2877780 (WHITLEY ERNEST M, et al); | [A]US3474809 (GORDON WILLIAM); | [A]US4313453 (HOLMES PAUL M) | International search | [A]US2336942 (LINDSAY CHARLES H); | [A]US2353765 (ANDERS MATHISEN); | [A]US2399553 (LINDSAY CHARLES H, et al); | [A]US2560091 (DAVIS CHARLES B); | [A]GB1133722 (GRAVINER COLNBROOK LTD); | [A]US4003395 (TYLER MAURICE EUGENE); | [A]AU5684280 (GRAVINER LTD KIDDE); | [A]US4351394 (ENK WILLIAM A); | [A]AU573839B (DOW CORNING LTD) |