Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0383368 | Global Dossier | 03.07.1991 | A3 | EP0383368 | 22.08.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AUPG618984 | 24.07.1984 | EP90106807 | 15.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8600969 | Global Dossier | 13.02.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPG618984 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU580323B | Global Dossier | 12.01.1989 | B2 | AU4602085 | 25.02.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPG618984 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0219500 | Global Dossier | 08.12.1988 | A4 | EP0219500 | 29.04.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPG618984 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1269908 | 05.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPG618984 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4715448 | 29.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPG618984 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Divisional application | EP0383368 |