EP0191778 - CLOUT PARTICULARLY FOR SHOEING THE HOOVES OF A HORSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steppers Vertriebs AG Poststr. 9 Zug/Schweiz / CH | [1986/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERMER, Armin Ludolfinger Weg 6b D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 02 /
GUST, Manfred Amselweg 8 CH-4565 Recherswil / CH | 03 /
GERMER, Claude Robert Bosch Limitada Rua Cesario Galeno 447-483 03071 Sao Paulo / BR | [2007/32] |
Former [1986/35] | 01 /
GERMER, Armin Ludolfinger Weg 6b D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | ||
02 /
GUST, Manfred Amselweg 8 CH-4565 Recherswil / CH | |||
03 /
GARETTE, Claude rue Charles de Gaulle Cité Foch D-1000 Berlin-Wittenau / DE | Representative(s) | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | ||
Former [1986/35] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. Hiebsch & Peege Patentanwälte Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85903256.7 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/35] | WO1985EP00304 | Priority number, date | DE19843423838 | 28.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3423838 | DE1985G851481 | 20.05.1985 Original published format: DE G0851481 | [1986/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600194 | Date: | 16.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0191778 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01L1/04, A01L7/02 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
A01L1/04 (EP);
A01L7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | HUFBESCHLAG INSBESONDERE ZUM BESCHLAGEN VON PFERDEHUFEN | [1986/35] | English: | CLOUT PARTICULARLY FOR SHOEING THE HOOVES OF A HORSE | [1986/35] | French: | FERRURE EN PARTICULIER POUR FERRER DES SABOTS DE CHEVAL | [1986/35] | File destroyed: | 18.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1986 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/27] | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2758655 [ ]; | BE512731 [ ]; | FR687384 [ ]; | FR787783 [ ]; | FR473413 [ ]; | FR2294637 [ ] |