Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
18.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] |
16.10.1987 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.1987 [1987/49] |
01.09.1987 | First examination report | |
25.07.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.09.1986 [1986/37] |
11.07.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] |