EP0187863 - AIR-FLOW CONTROL VALVE FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE AIR-CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | For all designated states SHIMIZU INDUSTRY COMPANY LTD. 1, Chasenboushita, Hitotsugi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIMIZU INDUSTRY COMPANY LTD. 1, Chasenboushita, Hitotsugi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | |||
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states SHIMIZU INDUSTRY COMPANY LTD. 1, Chasenboushita, Hitotsugi-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAYAKABE, Hiroshi 10, Yataminami 3-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 461 / JP | 02 /
MITOMI, Masaei 8, Kouei 3-chome Chiryu-shi Aichi 472 / JP | 03 /
MIYAJIMA, Mikio 2-7, Eguchi 3-chome Okazaki-shi Aichi 444 / JP | 04 /
NAKATA, Shuji 1-6-1, Kyowa-cho Oobu-shi Aichi 474 / JP | 05 /
SHIMIZU, Tadashi No. 306, B.C. Nanzan 19-1, Nanzan-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 467 / JP | 06 /
YOSHITO, Kazuharu No. 14-305, Chiryudanchi 4, Showa 9-chome Chiryu-shi Aichi 472 / JP | 07 /
NISHIU, Masamichi No. 101, Residence Setoyama 22, Setoyama Okehazama Arimatsu-cho Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 458 / JP | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/30] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85903376.3 | 03.07.1985 | [1986/30] | WO1985JP00373 | Priority number, date | JP19840143829 | 11.07.1984 Original published format: JP 14382984 | [1986/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600688 | Date: | 30.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187863 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187863 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, B29D9/00 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
B60H1/00678 (EP,US);
B60H1/00671 (KR);
B29C31/044 (EP,US);
B29C43/18 (EP,KR,US);
B29C43/206 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16K27/0218 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3438 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/7506 (EP,KR,US);
B60H2001/007 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/30] | Title | German: | LUFTDEBITREGELVENTIL FÜR FAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGE SOWIE DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1986/30] | English: | AIR-FLOW CONTROL VALVE FOR AN AUTOMOTIVE AIR-CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [1986/30] | French: | CLAPET DE COMMANDE D'ECOULEMENT D'AIR POUR UN APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DU CLAPET | [1986/30] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1986 | Translation filed | 05.03.1986 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1986 | Search fee paid | 05.03.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB957997 (MANFRED BEHR); | [A]US3197352 (COATES JAMES M); | [A]FR2238105 (FERODO SA [FR]); | [A]FR2447493 (FERODO SA) | International search | [A]JPS535365Y ; | [A]JPS5415477Y ; | [A]JPS54146547U ; | [A]JPS56140035U |