EP0190190 - CLUTCH BRAKE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIM, Yeon Keun 243-17 (12/4) Huksuk-dong Dongjak-ku Seoul 150 / KR | [1986/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/33] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 85903399.5 | 27.06.1985 | [1986/33] | WO1985KR00015 | Priority number, date | KR19840004781 | 10.08.1984 Original published format: KR 844781 | [1986/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601163 | Date: | 27.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190190 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0190190 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 27.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/24 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
B60T11/103 (EP,US);
B60T7/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/33] | Title | German: | BREMSVERFAHREN MITTELS DER KUPPLUNG | [1986/33] | English: | CLUTCH BRAKE METHOD | [1986/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE FREINAGE A L'AIDE DE LA PEDALE D'EMBRAYAGE | [1986/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1986 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1986 | Search fee paid | 11.04.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2122709 (KIA IND CO); | [X]GB1197737 (NAKANO AKIO [JP]); | [X]US3705643 (IWAOKA SEIJIRO, et al); | [X]DE1530662 (EICKE INGFRIED); | [A]DE1192061 (CATERPILLAR TRACTER CO) |