Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8600732 | Global Dossier | 30.01.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE8403733 | 16.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0188517 | Global Dossier | 30.07.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE8403733 | 16.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE443671 | 03.03.1986 | B | SE8403733L | 17.01.1986 | L | SE8403733D0 | 16.07.1984 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE8403733 | 16.07.1984 |