EP0188517 - A FOOT PEDAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.1987 [1987/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROST, Leif, Conny Bomansgatan 24 B S-722 20 Västeras / SE | [1986/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/31] | Application number, filing date | 85903447.2 | 16.07.1985 | [1986/31] | WO1985SE00283 | Priority number, date | SE19840003733 | 16.07.1984 Original published format: SE 8403733 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8600732 | Date: | 30.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188517 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/14 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
G05G1/30 (EP);
G05G1/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | FUSSPEDALVORRICHTUNG | [1986/31] | English: | A FOOT PEDAL DEVICE | [1986/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PEDALE | [1986/31] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 19.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/45] | 15.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 16.02.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1468571 ; | [A]US1487197 ; | [A]US2123299 ; | [A]US3563111 |