EP0228369 - MEANS FOR PULLING TAPE FROM A REEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1987/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERTRICH, Friedrich, R. Sugar Loaf Star Route Boulder, CO 80302 / US | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/36] |
Former [1987/29] | Mongrédien, André c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85903483.7 | 12.06.1985 | [1987/29] | WO1985US01114 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607471 | Date: | 18.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228369 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228369 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03B1/04, G03B1/56, G11B15/00, G11B15/32, G11B17/00, G03C1/76, G03D13/10 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
G11B15/67 (EP);
G03B1/04 (KR);
G11B23/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABZIEHEN EINES BANDES VON EINER SPULE | [1987/29] | English: | MEANS FOR PULLING TAPE FROM A REEL | [1987/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE TIRAGE DE BANDES | [1987/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1987 | Search fee paid | 09.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [Y]US1655297 (EDWARD THORNTON JOHN); | [A]US3136464 (SCHMID RICHARD G); | [A]US3153516 (DE LOOF RICHARD M, et al); | [X]US3706423 (NEFF JOSEPH J); | [A]US4090680 (KARSH IRVING); | [Y]US4244640 (ALDRICH J WINTHROP, et al) |