EP0230405 - IGNITION DEVICE WITH MAGNETIC GENERATOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1990 [1990/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADEMANN, Lothar Sülchenstrasse 42 D-7407 Rottenburg / DE | 02 /
HIRT, Adam Pelzetleite 27 D-8501 Ammerndorf / DE | 03 /
MICHEL, Hartmut Herderstrasse 74 D-7410 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
SCHMID, Hans-Dieter Kamenzerstrasse 8 D-8500 Nürnberg 60 / DE | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael Kastanienweg 38 D-7410 Reutlingen 3 / DE | [1987/32] | Application number, filing date | 85903812.7 | 31.07.1985 | [1987/32] | WO1985DE00258 | Priority number, date | DE19843443739 | 30.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3443739 | [1987/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603259 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230405 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230405 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F02P1/08 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
F02P1/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | ZÜNDANLAGE FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN MIT EINEM MAGNETGENERATOR | [1987/32] | English: | IGNITION DEVICE WITH MAGNETIC GENERATOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1987/32] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ALLUMAGE A GENERATEUR MAGNETIQUE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1987/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1985 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 15.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.10.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB1155939 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | FR2208457 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | FR2211050 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | US3894525 [ ] (HAUBNER GEORG, et al); | DE2701750 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | DE2709745 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | DE2712695 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | DE2851097 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | GB2039994 [ ] (HITACHI LTD) |