EP0191052 - Platinum Resistance Thermometer and Method for Forming a Platinum Resistance Thermometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/34] | METHOD FOR FORMING A PLATINUM RESISTANCE THERMOMETER | ||
[1993/18] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 West 78th Street Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1986/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHARA, Robert, C. 16755 Terry Pines Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 02 /
RUF, James, A. 7371 Berkshire Way Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | [1986/34] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 85903923.2 | 25.07.1985 | [1986/34] | WO1985US01398 | Priority number, date | US19840636141 | 31.07.1984 Original published format: US 636141 | US19840636142 | 31.07.1984 Original published format: US 636142 | [1986/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8601027 | Date: | 13.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0191052 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0191052 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01C1/012, H01C3/04, H01C7/02, H01C7/04, C23C14/00 | [1986/34] | CPC: |
G01K7/183 (EP);
H01C17/003 (EP);
H01C17/12 (EP);
H01C7/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/34] | Title | German: | Platin-Widerstandsthermometer und Herstellungsverfahren für ein Platin-Widerstandsthermometer | [1993/18] | English: | Platinum Resistance Thermometer and Method for Forming a Platinum Resistance Thermometer | [1993/18] | French: | Thermomètre à résistance en platine et méthode pour former un thermomètre à résistance en platine | [1993/18] |
Former [1986/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STARKEN THERMOMETERS AUS PLATINUM | ||
Former [1986/34] | METHOD FOR FORMING A PLATINUM RESISTANCE THERMOMETER | ||
Former [1986/34] | METHODE POUR FORMER UN THERMOMETRE A RESISTANCE EN PLATINE | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1986 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.1986 | Search fee paid | 17.03.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.1994
05.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Heraeus Sensor GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.1994
05.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Heraeus Sensor GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14 63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | 10.05.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 03.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.01.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.02.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2188158 (BAILEY METER CO [US]); | [XD]US4050052 (REICHELT WALTER, et al); | [AD]US4072593 (DIEHL WALTER, et al); | [A]DE2706418 (HERAEUS GMBH W C); | [AD]GB2096645 (ROSEMOUNT ENG CO LTD) | [AD] - COURSE MANUAL FOR THE AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, 1981; "Sputter depositions and ion beam processes" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 26, 24th December 1979, page 616, abstract no. 220426n, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. HECQ et al.: "Effect of oxygen on crystallographic properties of platinum films deposited by reactive sputtering", & VIDE, COUCHES MINCES 1979, 196, Suppl., 69-77 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 18, 1st November 1982, page 689, abstract no. 154621t, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.A. ZAVADSKII: "Preparation of gallium phosphide-based matrix epitaxial structures", & TEKHNOL. POLUCH. ELEKTR. SVOISTVA SOEDIN. A3B5, MATER. VSES. KONF. 1981, 47-51 | International search | [Y]US4103275 (DIEHL WALTER, et al); | [Y]US4129848 (FRANK R [US], et al); | [A]US4286377 (HURKO BOHDAN, et al) |