EP0260253 - EDDY CURRENT BRAKE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berger, Johann Innsbrucker Strasse 43 A-6300 Wörgl / AT | [1988/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIWALD, Andreas Anichstrasse 5 A-6300 Wörgl / AT | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Paul Torggler Dr. Engelbert Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 85903972.9 | 31.07.1985 | [1988/12] | WO1985AT00020 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700988 | Date: | 12.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260253 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260253 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02K49/04 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
H02K49/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | WIRBELSTROMBREMSE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1988/12] | English: | EDDY CURRENT BRAKE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [1988/12] | French: | FREIN A COURANTS DE FOUCAULT POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR | [1988/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 08.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 07.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1258803 [ ]; | FR1456783 [ ] (NERVUS PARIS); | FR1573051 [ ]; | FR2044114 [ ] (THOMPSON VICTOR); | FR2102600 [ ] (SERMAG); | FR2217852 [ ] (LABAVIA [FR]); | GB2140978 [ ] (MYANO SEISAKUSHO KK) |